HI SB606 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 237, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1340).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 237, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1340).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii to pay student employees at new or expanded worksites on each campus. (CD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Appropriation; Student Employees ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | House | Act 237, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1340). |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 237, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1340). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 97) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 97). |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Luke, Takai, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kidani, Kahele, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:05AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:15AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 4:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kidani replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Choy, Luke Co-Chairs; Takai, Fale. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 537). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1522) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1033) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hanohano, Nakashima, Ohno, Takai, Takumi, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-12-13 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 176) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 668) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 417) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Slom. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1045 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 6