HI SB606 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB606
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals all criminal penalties regarding marijuana except with regard to furnishing marijuana to a minor. Requires courts to expunge a person's criminal record for a marijuana conviction if that charge was the only charge emanating from a single set of facts and circumstances.
Title
Relating To Marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
HB148 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to IAC, referral sheet 2
HB148 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to IAC, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=606&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB606_.HTM |