HI SB610 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB610
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Kauai flooding disaster relief appropriation made in Act 12, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, to include flood mitigation measures. Extends the lapse date of the appropriation to June 30, 2020. Exempts the appropriation from certain restrictions on transfers of or changes to appropriations.
Title
Relating To Disaster Relief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 623) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB610 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
HB329 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 035, 06/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136).
HB329 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 035, 06/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1136).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=610&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB610_.HTM |