HI SB614 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 281, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1387).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Comptroller and the State Foundation on Culture and the Arts to commission permanent works of art to honor the late U.S. Senator Daniel K. Inouye and the late U.S. Representative Patsy T. Mink. Appropriates $250,000 for each year of the 2013-2015 fiscal biennium. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Art; State Foundation on Culture and the Arts; Daniel Inouye; Patsy Mink; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 281, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1387).
2013-07-09HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 281, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1387).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige.
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 127) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 127).
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Takayama, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower.
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Kouchi, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 11:00AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 11:00AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-22HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 712).
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s).
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee.
2013-04-18HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 423.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Takai, Takayama Co-Chairs; Brower, Ward.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Wakai, Chair; Nishihara, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 538).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1520) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-01HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
2013-03-22HouseReported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1156) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-20HouseThe committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-19HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2013-03-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-20-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 178) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 608) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2013-02-14SenateReported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 262) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2013-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom.
2013-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 1:15PM in conference room 414.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to TEC, WAM.
2013-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback