HI SB618 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB618
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or repeals various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes and the Session Laws of Hawaii for the purposes of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, and deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions.
Title
Relating To Statutory Revision: Amending Or Repealing Various Provisions Of The Hawaii Revised Statutes And The Session Laws Of Hawaii For The Purposes Of Correcting Errors And References, Clarifying Language, And Deleting Obsolete Or Unnecessary Provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB618 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC.
HB1268 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Act 111, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
HB1268 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Act 111, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=618&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB618_.HTM |