HI SB623 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 11:30AM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 11:30AM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the current renewable energy technology systems tax credit with tax credits for solar energy property and wind energy property. Requires the Department of Taxation and Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to report tax credits claimed under the renewable energy technology tax credit and make recommendations to the legislature. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB623 HD3)
Title
Renewable Energy; Solar Energy Property; Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 11:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 11:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: C. Lee, McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Lowen, Thielen. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Kidani, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 539). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Yamashita voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Hashem, McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1586) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Yamashita, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Coffman, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1198) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, McDermott. |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fale, Hanohano, Ing, Jordan, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3). |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 988) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fale. |
2013-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-14-13 8:35AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-13 8:35am. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 179) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 762) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Ruderman. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to ENE/EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |