HI SB636 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Fortifies the recreational renaissance program of the department of land and natural resources through various amendments to state law. (SB636 HD2)
Title
Recreational Renaissance Program
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-05-01 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 4:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-05-01 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 2:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 10:00 AM in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-29-09 3:30pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 756). | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Fukunaga, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Ito, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Har, Yamashita, Thielen. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 472). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Berg, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Hanohano, Nakashima voting no (6) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Mizuno, Morita, Sagum, Takai, Ward excused (7). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-2009. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1714) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-06 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Choy, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Wooley, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Brower; and Excused: none. | |
2009-04-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-06-2009 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Re-referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 42 | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused (6). | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1272) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-03-23 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Har, Chang, Coffman, Herkes, C. Lee, Luke, Morita, Sagum, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-23-09 9:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 03-16-09 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, referral sheet 28 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 470) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Sakamoto, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ihara. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-09 8:30 AM in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |