HI SB636 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implements voting provisions for uniformed services and overseas absentee voters, including electronic transmission of balloting materials, as required by the Military and Overseas Voter Empowerment Act. (SD1)
Title
Elections; Uniformed Services and Overseas Absentee Voters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 164) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM deferred the measure until 02-08-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |