HI SB636 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds to be appropriated into and out of the rental housing revolving fund, dwelling unit revolving fund, and, contingent upon the enactment of S.B. No. 878 in any form, the home ownership housing revolving fund. Requires an amount of the funds appropriated out of the rental housing revolving fund be used to create permanent supportive housing units for chronically homeless individuals. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-14SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 320) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:20PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HOU, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1312 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Transmitted to Governor.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback