HI SB638 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Act 015, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adds unlicensed sale of liquor and unlicensed manufacture of liquor as offenses for which property is subject to forfeiture and increases the grade of the offense of unlicensed sale of liquor to a class C felony. Amends definitions of "organized crime" and "racketeering activity" to include the unlicensed sale of liquor. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Liquor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateAct 015, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
2019-04-24HouseAct 015, on 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
2019-04-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 537).
2019-04-03HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Matayoshi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Eli, Gates, Holt, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, Okimoto, Perruso, San Buenaventura, Thielen, Todd, Tokioka, Ward, Wildberger voting no (16) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseDeferred one day 04-03-19.
2019-04-02HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1929), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1474), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Say.
2019-03-14HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, CPC, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 200) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateDeferred until 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-14SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 380) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-01SenateRe-Referred to CPH, JDC.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to PSM/CPH, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1210 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to JUD/CPC, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback