HI SB639 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that ten per cent of the moneys in the Hawaii tobacco settlement special fund shall be appropriated to the executive office on aging for purposes of the kupuna care program and the kupuna caregivers program. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Kupuna Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 561) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 9:10AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB639 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB880 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB880 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.