HI SB640 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the manufacture, sale, or distribution of child care products and toys for young children that contain bisphenol-A or phthalates beginning 1/1/2014. Requires manufacturers to choose safe alternatives. Prohibits the use of packages and packaging containing lead, cadmium, mercury, and hexavalent chromium beginning 1/1/2014. Prohibits the Hawaii health systems corporation from purchasing and using vinyl intravenous solution bags and vinyl tubing beginning 1/1/2014. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; Toxic Substances; Bisphenol-A; Phthalates; Packaging; Metals; Vinyl Intravenous Solution Bags; Vinyl Tubing; Hawaii Heath Systems Corporation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-12-18 Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
2013-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2013-02-15SenateReported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 351) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2013-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2013-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 2:30PM in conference room 229.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to HTH, CPN.
2013-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB351 (Same As) 2013-01-22 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback