HI SB650 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB650
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources to combat rapid ohia death in the State. Requires matching funds.
Title
Relating To Rapid Ohia Death.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB650 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
HB423 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB423 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=650&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB650_.HTM |