HI SB655 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 250, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows health professionals, subject to certain requirements, to treat the partners of patients diagnosed as having certain sexually transmitted diseases by dispensing or prescribing medication to the partners without examining the partners. Provides limited liability protection. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexually Transmitted Diseases; Expedited Partner Therapy; Health Professionals; Prescription Drugs; Labeling; Record Keeping

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 250, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
2013-07-09HouseAct 250, on 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 78).
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 4-30-13
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 78) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Wooley, Kobayashi, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
2013-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon.
2013-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Belatti, McKelvey, Wooley Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Solomon.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 542).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
2013-04-05HouseReported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1545) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito.
2013-04-03HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Evans, Har, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Ito.
2013-04-02HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-01HouseThe committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-13.
2013-03-25HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:15PM in conference room 325.
2013-03-25HouseThe committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04/01/13.
2013-03-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 03-25-13 2:20PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Say excused (2).
2013-03-21HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
2013-03-13HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan.
2013-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 185) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 604) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
2013-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2013-02-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2013-02-06SenateReported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2013-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-01-24SenateThe committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to HTH, CPN.
2013-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback