HI SB655 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 168, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 168, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the news media, under certain conditions, to access areas that are closed pursuant to emergency management powers of the Governor and Mayor. Limits the liability of the Senate and counties. Specifies that the State, counties, and designated emergency management authority are not responsible for providing logistical support to media accessing emergency areas. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Media Access.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 168, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 168, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 79) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 79). |
2017-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, San Buenaventura, LoPresti, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 4:35PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-17 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Wakai. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Thielen. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1564) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott. |
2017-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3). |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1199) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-15 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-16-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 222) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 860) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 444) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |