HI SB657 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB657
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric vehicles to pay for unmetered fee parking when parked for any period longer than an initial 4 hours. Extends the repeal date of Act 168, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, from 6/30/2020 to 6/30/2023. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-14-19 8:35AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, TRN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 208) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, Shimabukuro. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, J.Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 857) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TRS/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 415) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB657 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.