HI SB664 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB664
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows agencies to enter performance contracts to undertake or implement energy conservation or alternate energy measures for vehicles and vehicle fleets. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Contracting For Public Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 650) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB664 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB401 (Same As) 2019-07-01 - Act 144, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246).
HB401 (Same As) 2019-07-01 - Act 144, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246).
Subjects
Energy Efficiency
Energy Retrofit and Performance Contracting for Public Facilities
Vehicle Fleets
Vehicles
Energy Retrofit and Performance Contracting for Public Facilities
Vehicle Fleets
Vehicles