HI SB666 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB666
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Airports Corporation (HAC)to assume the authority, functions, and duties of the DOT related to airports and aeronautics. Makes HAC subject to Chapters 103D and 104, HRS. Provides for project labor agreements. Appropriates funds for the transfer of functions from DOT to HAC. (SB666 HD2)
Title
Relating To An Airports Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1676) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1369) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2019-03-14 | House | Re-referred to TRN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 213) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Riviere. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Taniguchi). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1073) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM, with Senator Kim voting "No". |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 102) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB666 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).