HI SB671 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts students in post-secondary education programs from immunization requirements if they attend classes exclusively online or through distance learning. Takes effect on 7/1/2020. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Post-secondary Education Student Immunizations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 214) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 848) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2019-02-06SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 42) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HRE, CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1157 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Transmitted to Governor.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback