HI SB674 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits conversion therapy for sexual orientation and gender identity. (SB674 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Gender Identity.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1684) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD/CPC.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tokioka.
2019-03-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-21-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, JUD/CPC, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 882) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB664 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Transmitted to Governor.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback