HI SB68 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 280, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1386).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows judges discretion in setting incarceration terms when sentencing drug offenders in certain class B and class C felony. Excludes certain offenses cases. (SB68 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing; Drug Offenses; Mandatory Minimums

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 280, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1386).
2013-07-09HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 280, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1386).
2013-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-13(Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-04-29SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-04-25HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 748).
2013-04-25SenatePassed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Nishihara.
2013-04-24SenateOne Day Notice 04-25-13.
2013-04-24SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-25-13.
2013-04-24SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2013-04-22SenateThe Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-19SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Rhoads Chair; Belatti, C. Lee, Thielen.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 500).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Ohno voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused (2).
2013-04-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-03-28HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee.
2013-03-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-21HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-22-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-03-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-22-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-18HouseRe-referred to JUD, referral sheet 39
2013-03-07HouseReferred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 66) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-02-28SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-12-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2013-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2013-01-17SenateReferred to JDL.
2013-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1054 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 6

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback