HI SB682 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 179, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 179, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the authority of the county fire chiefs to examine building plans and documentation to ensure that they are in compliance with the county's adopted fire code. Requires the issuance of permits before work may begin. Effective July 1, 2013. (SB682 HD1)
Title
Fire Protection; Fire and Life Safety Standards; Construction Permits
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 179, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 179, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 753). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Deferred until 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Aquino, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Yamashita, McDermott. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1558), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-13 3:58PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03/27/13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-25-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1192) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-21 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamane. |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-21-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to PBS, CPC, referral sheet 33 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 397) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-13. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 6 offered. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 481) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-19-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |