HI SB682 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB682
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes, beginning January 1, 2020, labeling requirements for any food or raw agricultural commodity sold in the State that contains a genetically engineered material, or was produced with a genetically engineered material; establishes exceptions; establishes violations; and requires director of health to adopt rules.
Title
Relating To Food Labeling.
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB682 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=682&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB682_.HTM |