HI SB69 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 254, 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires county police departments under certain conditions to fingerprint, photograph, and perform background checks on individuals who wish to register a firearm that was procured out-of-state. Authorizes the police departments to assess a fee for conducting a fingerprint check and specifies the amount of the fee. Extends the time period for registering a firearm procured out-of-state for consistency with the time period for registering firearms obtained in or imported into the State. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearm Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 254, 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357).
2013-07-09HouseAct 254, on 7/2/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Fukumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fale, McDermott voting no (3) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 162) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 162).
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Rhoads, Ing, Ichiyama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kouchi, Green, Ige, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 312.
2013-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 312.
2013-04-19SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 10:30AM in conference room 312.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s).
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee.
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 10:30AM in conference room 312.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Aquino, Rhoads, Ing Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Thielen.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Green, Kahele, Kouchi.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-09SenateDeferred until 04-11-13.
2013-04-05SenateDeferred until 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 432).
2013-04-04HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1436), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson.
2013-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 3:15PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
2013-03-22HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1201), recommending referral to FIN.
2013-03-19HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none.
2013-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Carroll, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Kawakami, McKelvey, Morikawa, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3).
2013-03-15HouseReported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 984) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2013-03-14HouseThe committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Nakashima, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Takumi.
2013-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 67) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon, Taniguchi . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 805) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Kidani, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
2013-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-13 9:45AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-02-15SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 334) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2013-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-07-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2013-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2013-01-17SenateReferred to PSM, WAM.
2013-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback