HI SB693 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 133, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 133, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies what pedestrians are required to do when in a crosswalk while a countdown timer is operating. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Statewide Traffic Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act 133, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235). |
2019-06-28 | House | Act 133, on 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Kim . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, Wildberger voting no (3) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 64) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 64). |
2019-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, C. Lee, Hashimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, McDermott. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, K. Rhoads, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; English, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Say, McDermott. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-04-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 523). |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1922), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-19 2:00PM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1396) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-15-19 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 28 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 523) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella, J.Keohokalole . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-19. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report filed. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2) Ayes, 15. Noes, 9 (Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Dela Cruz, Fevella, Inouye, Keith-Agaran, J.Keohokalole, Kidani, K. Rhoads). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 3 offered. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 814) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 120) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |