HI SB697 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB697
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for the substantial reduction and eradication of certain invasive species in Maui County.
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB697 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM.
HB265 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
HB265 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=697&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB697_.HTM |