HI SB698 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Codifies sustainable development goals based on the United Nations' Sustainable Development Goals and indicators. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Sustainable Development Goals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 219) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 704) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateReported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 181) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to GVO, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback