HI SB703 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB703
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to prepare a resource land acquisition plan by 6/30/2021. Requires periodic reporting to the Legislature on the progress of preparing the plan.
Title
Relating To Resource Land Acquisition Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB703 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
HB264 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB264 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=703&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB703_.HTM |