HI SB712 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 169, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 169, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Governor to submit summarized comparisons by department of the following for fiscal year 2017-2018 and fiscal year 2018-2019: (1) budgeted and actual/estimated expenditures for operating costs, with breakdowns by cost elements and means of financing; and (2) the position ceiling and number of positions filled or estimated to be filled. Requires this information to be submitted with the variance report for 2019, with a recommendation of whether similar information should be required in future variance reports. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Variance Report.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 169, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 169, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 84) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 84). |
2017-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; English, Galuteria. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Tupola. |
2017-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 524). |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1584) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 44). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 543) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |