HI SB718 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:00PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:00PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Hawaii Strategic Development Corporation to continue the HI Growth Initiative, an investment program to support high-growth entrepreneurial companies in the State. Requires annual report to Legislature. Authorizes DBEDT, in collaboration with DOA, to perform studies and analysis relating to establishing facilities on the Island of Hawaii for quarantine inspection and treatment and handling incoming and outgoing commodities and appropriates funds for this purpose. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB718 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Strategic Development Corporation; HI Growth Initiative; Quarantine; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 3:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-23-14 3:20PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Cullen Co-Chairs; Brower, Tokioka, Ward Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 515). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1537-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-18 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-18-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 198) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 813) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-13 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 428) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 3:15PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB557 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.