HI SB718 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the state mortgage insurance program to guarantee up to fifteen per cent of the principal balance of real property mortgage loans, under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Homebuyer Assistance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee on HOU deferred the measure.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on HOU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HOU/CPH, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback