HI SB723 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits members of a county council to jointly attend and speak at certain community meetings or presentations; provided that the meetings or presentations are events open to the public. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Public Meetings; Community Meetings; County Council Members; Permitted Interactions of Members
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 411) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:05PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB322 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1