HI SB723 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 225, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 225, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Judiciary to post the titles of all filings and all minutes in paternity cases to the Judiciary's website after redacting any information in which an individual has a significant privacy interest, subject to certain circumstances. Establishes the same confidentiality standards for paternity cases as other custody and support cases heard by the family court. Effective 1/1/2021. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Parentage Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 225, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1327). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 225, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1327). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 52) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 52). |
2019-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Gates, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 3:16PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:05PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Kim, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Gates Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 668). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Deferred one day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2081), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 225) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 780) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |