HI SB725 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Act 007, 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that a condominium association's proxies and ballots may be destroyed ninety days, rather than thirty days, after an association meeting, unless the election is contested, in which case the documents shall be retained until resolution of the contested election. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Condominiums.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateAct 007, 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
2019-04-15HouseAct 007, on 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
2019-03-27SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-03-27SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 509).
2019-03-25HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-22HouseDeferred one day 03-25-19.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1560), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Belatti.
2019-03-12HouseRe-referred to CPC, referral sheet 31
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 226) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 762) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback