HI SB727 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB727
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows office of Hawaiian affairs employees to join the State's civil service and public employee collective bargaining systems. Creates bargaining unit (15) as a separate collective bargaining unit for employees of the office of Hawaiian affairs in the event they vote to do so. Increases the maximum amount of public funds available to each candidate running for the Board of Trustees of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs to fifteen per cent of the expenditure limit established for each election. Increases the amount each board of trustees candidate must raise in order to qualify for public funds. Requires that names of candidates running for seats on the board of trustees of the office of Hawaiian affairs be listed on the ballot in random order. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HWN/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 323) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Gabbard. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN/LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB727 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.