HI SB731 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB731
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to HWN/LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to HWN/LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a department of civil service for the office of Hawaiian affairs to apply merit-based hiring practices to future office of Hawaiian affairs employees; permits employees of the office of Hawaiian affairs to enter into collective bargaining agreements. Confers all existing employees of the office of Hawaiian affairs permanent civil service status and specifies that any rights, benefits, and privileges they have accrued shall not be diminished by transitioning to their collective bargaining unit.
Title
Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN/LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB731 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HWN/LCA, WAM.
HB1113 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1113 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=731&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB731_.HTM |