HI SB740 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSG/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes each county to adopt ordinances establishing a minimum housing density on state lands that are within an urban district and zoned for development or redevelopment. Allows developers to be exempt from this requirement under certain conditions. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing Density.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HSG/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 229) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Moriwaki, Ruderman. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1194) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-19 10:10AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from PSM/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Harimoto.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on PSM/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:45PM in conference room CR 225.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to PSM/HOU, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback