HI SB742 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB742
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the cap amounts of the tax deduction for individual housing accounts. Repeals requirement for the payment of taxes on distributions used for the purchase of a first principal residence. Requires each employer in the State to provide its employees with an option for the automatic direct deposit of their wages into the employees' individual housing accounts.
Title
Relating To Individual Housing Accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on LCA deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU/LCA, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB742 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=742&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB742_.HTM |