HI SB750 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 11:00AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 11:00AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a media infrastructure project tax credit for qualified media infrastructure projects in West Oahu or on the most populous island in a county with a population between 100,000 and 175,000. Provides for recapture of the media infrastructure project tax credit in certain circumstances. Requires annual report to Legislature. Effective January 20, 2050. (SB750 HD1)
Title
Media Infrastructure Project Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 11:00AM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 11:00AM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 423. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Takai, Tsuji, Luke Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Dela Cruz, Chair; Wakai, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Baker, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 467). |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Wooley voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1479), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Yamashita; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Wooley voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1186) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-18 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-19-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Mizuno excused (2). |
2013-03-14 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 948), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, McDermott. |
2013-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-08 | House | Re-referred to VMI, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 203) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EGH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Chun Oakland, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-14-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH deferred the measure until 02-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 3:15PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to EGH/TEC, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB566 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).