HI SB753 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 5:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 5:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Agriculture to enter into leases and other land transactions with the Agribusiness Development Corporation (ADC) for food production or organic livestock feed development. Creates a program under the ADC, with assistance of the High Technology Development Corporation, to encourage organic food production and organic livestock feed development. Exempts ADC from certain qualifying provisions to receive non-agricultural park lands for growing food or developing organic livestock feed. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB753 HD1)
Title
Land Transactions; Food Production; Organic Livestock Feed; ADC; DOA; HTDC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 5:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-17 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 703). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senator Dela Cruz added as conferee. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senator Ige discharged as Co-Chair. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Ige, Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); L. Thielen, Slom. |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Wooley, Evans, Onishi Co-Chairs; Cullen, Cheape. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 548). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cheape, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Say, Thielen, Tokioka, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1575), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Jordan, Morikawa; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from AGR/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Coffman, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Ohno, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Takayama, Cheape; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-14-13 11:00AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on AGR/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-13. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Monday, 03-11-13 8:40AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 204) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 680) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |