HI SB756 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB756
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans, beginning January 1, 2020, the import for profit, sale, and offer for sale of any cosmetic in the State, if the final product or any component of the product was developed or manufactured using animal testing performed on or after January 1, 2020. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
Relating To Cosmetics.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB756 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM.
HB704 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
HB704 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=756&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB756_.HTM |