HI SB758 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB758
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prioritizes the duties of the division of the consumer advocate to proceedings that involve accounting, financing, and utility rates.
Title
Relating To The Division Of The Consumer Advocate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB758 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
HB275 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB275 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=758&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB758_.HTM |