HI SB759 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 217, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Agriculture to establish a 2-year Agricultural Theft and Vandalism Pilot Project to examine the effectiveness of prosecuting agricultural theft and agricultural vandalism in the counties of Hawaii and Maui. Appropriates funds. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 217, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
2019-07-09HouseAct 217, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 171) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 171).
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, C. Lee, Cullen, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:02AM in conference room 224.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 10:02AM in conference room 224.
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; K. Rhoads, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Creagan, C. Lee, Cullen Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 748).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2146), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
2019-04-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-21HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1532), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Yamane.
2019-03-18HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-18HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-19.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-18-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1358) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-13HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-13-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 235) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 995) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-05SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 33) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to AEN, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1503 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback