HI SB762 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB762
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and appropriates funds for 1 FTE P-20 agriculture education coordinator position within the University of Hawaii at Manoa College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources. Specifies duties of the coordinator and P-20 agriculture education working group. (SB762 HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 4:30PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Riviere, Kidani Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Creagan, Cullen Co-Chairs; DeCoite, Okimoto. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 672). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2118), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from LHE/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1505) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan. |
2019-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE/AGR on Friday, 03-15-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 237) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 972) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 278) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1102 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB762 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 4:30PM in conference room 329.
SB762 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 4:30PM in conference room 329.