HI SB764 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB764
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to EDU/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to EDU/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education to equip all classroom doors with interior locks by January 1, 2020, to connect all interior and exterior school locations via intercom, and to monitor all school perimeters not secured by a physical barrier. Authorizes establishment of an emergency management plan aligned with federal guidelines for all schools to prepare for and respond to an emergency or a disaster. Establishes a school safety facial recognition pilot program. Appropriates funds for purposes of this Act.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU/PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB764 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to EDU/PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Education
Emergency Preparedness
Facial Recognition Technology Pilot Program
School Safety
Department of Education
Emergency Preparedness
Facial Recognition Technology Pilot Program
School Safety
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=764&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB764_.HTM |