HI SB768 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 4:30PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits certain minors to consent to treatment or counseling by a mental health professional. Requires, as part of the standard of care, the minor patient to be informed about confidentiality. Restricts disclosure of a minor's payment information for mental health treatment in certain circumstances. (SB768 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Adolescent Mental Health Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 4:30PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826).
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:05PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-22HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 750).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2167), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-29HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1663) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2019-03-14HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1311) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 240) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateDeferred until 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 813) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-07SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 99) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB584 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback