HI SB768 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB768
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain minors to consent to treatment or counseling by a mental health professional. Requires, as part of the standard of care, the minor patient to be informed about confidentiality. Restricts disclosure of a minor's payment information for mental health treatment in certain circumstances. (SB768 HD2)
Title
Relating To Adolescent Mental Health Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 4:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 750). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2167), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1663) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1311) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 240) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 813) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 99) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB584 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB768 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 4:30PM in conference room 229.
SB768 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 4:30PM in conference room 229.