HI SB770 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 246, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a high school education or its equivalent as a condition for new applicants to obtain a license as a real estate broker or real estate salesperson. Effective 7/1/2020. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Real Estate Licenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 246, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348).
2019-07-09HouseAct 246, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Kim, Moriwaki . 3 No(es): Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 60) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 60).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-24SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 858).
2019-04-24HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2019-04-12HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899).
2019-04-12SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateDeferred One Day 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 531).
2019-04-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1930), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1633) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 241) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 754) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB63 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback