HI SB774 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Board of Dentistry to adopt rules for the regulation of dental assistants using certification options based on education level and permitted duties. Requires the Board to report to the Legislature on the progress of any rules adopted. (SB774 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Professional And Vocational Licensing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Changed: Representative Ohno added as Co-Chair. Representative D. Kobayashi discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Member.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: D. Kobayashi, Takumi, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Mizuno, Matsumoto.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 673).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2135), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-04-02HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:05PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-02HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19 2:05pm.
2019-03-29HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-29-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1590) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JUD.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Har, D. Kobayashi, McDermott, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1328) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 243) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 792) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB73 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback