HI SB78 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 276, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1396).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 276, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1396).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Executive Office on Early Learning (EOEL) as the administrative authority for state-funded prekindergarten programs, and private partnership-funded prekindergarten programs in the public schools, except for special education and Title I-funded prekindergarten programs. Transfers prekindergarten programs in DOE and charter schools, except for special education and Title I-funded prekindergarten programs, to EOEL. Clarifies the role and responsibilities of EOEL in the public prekindergarten program. Requires DOE to adhere to certain quality standards and work with EOEL. Makes appropriations. (SB78 HD2)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 276, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1396). |
2019-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 276, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1396). |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-03 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 969). |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-02-19. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-02-19. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2019-04-25 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 963). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Discharged. |
2019-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903). |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 724). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2208) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-04-19 2:16PM in conference room 308. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-04-19. |
2019-04-01 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1670) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 40) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1115) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 65) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |